EP0632970 - Cellulose acetate based products, their use in the manufacture of filtertows for the production of tobacco smoke filters as well as filtertows and tobacco smoke filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Acetow GmbH Engesserstrasse 8 79108 Freiburg / DE | [2000/02] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Rhodia Acetow Aktiengesellschaft Engesserstrasse 8 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC RHODIA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Engesserstrasse 8 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teufel, Eberhard, Dipl.-Chem. Schwarzwaldstrasse 46 D-79194 Gundelfingen / DE | 02 /
Willmund, Rolf, Dipl.biol.-Dr. habil. Glimpenheimer Strasse 49 D-79312 Emmendingen / DE | [1995/02] | Representative(s) | Hagemann, Heinrich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107825.5 | 20.05.1994 | [1995/02] | Priority number, date | DE19934322966 | 09.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4322966 | [1995/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0632970 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0632970 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632970 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/10, A24D3/14 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
A24D3/068 (EP,US);
A24D3/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24D3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1995/02] | Title | German: | Aus Celluloseacetat geformte Gebilde, deren Verwendung zur Herstellung von Filtertow,Verwendung des Filtertows zur Herstellung eines Tabakrauchfilterelements sowie Filtertow und Tabakrauchfilterelement | [1995/02] | English: | Cellulose acetate based products, their use in the manufacture of filtertows for the production of tobacco smoke filters as well as filtertows and tobacco smoke filters | [1995/02] | French: | Produits à base d'acétate de cellulose, leur utilisation pour la fabrication de cordons filtrants pour la fabrication de filtres à fumée de tabac ainsi que les cordons filtrants et filtres à cigarettes | [1995/02] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 28.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 12.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.01.2000 | NL | 12.01.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 12.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE656697 (EASTMAN KODAK) [X] 1,4,8-10,12-15 * page 3, line 1 - line 21; example 1 *; | [X]US3349779 (LEONARD RAY E, et al) [X] 1,4,5,8-10,12-15* examples 1,2 *; | [X]GB2230687 (PECSI DOHANYGYAR [HU]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * examples 1,4 *; | [PX]EP0597478 (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [PX] 1,3,6-10,12-16 * page 3, line 45 - line 55 * * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 10; claims 1,18-20,26-33 * | [X] - JOJI ONO ET AL., "Preferential Retention of Benzo[a]pyrene in Tobacco Smoke by -Lactoglobulin in the Cigarette Filter Structure", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (1981), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 173 - 177 [X] 1,3,8-10 * page 174, column L * |