Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59406473D1 | 27.08.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE59406473 | 21.05.1994 | DE4322190 | 03.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0633620 | Global Dossier | 22.07.1998 | B1 | EP0633620 | 11.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4322190 | 03.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE168823T | 15.08.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4322190 | 03.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4322190 | 12.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4322190 | 03.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0633620T | 26.04.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4322190 | 03.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2120539T | 01.11.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4322190 | 03.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3027562T | 30.11.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4322190 | 03.07.1993 |