EP0637012 - Signal processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kane, Joji 4-34, Jingu 1-chome Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP | 02 /
Nohara, Akira 10-17, Matsuzonocho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662 / JP | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94108160.6 | 18.01.1991 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | JP19900008593 | 18.01.1990 Original published format: JP 859390 | JP19900008594 | 18.01.1990 Original published format: JP 859490 | JP19900033209 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3320990 | JP19900033212 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: JP 3321290 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0637012 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0637012 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0637012 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G10L3/02 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
G10L21/0208 (EP,US);
G10L15/02 (KR);
G10L21/0232 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Rauschreduzierung | [1995/05] | English: | Signal processing device | [1995/05] | French: | Appareil de réduction de bruit | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91100591.6 / EP0438174 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - H.NAGABUCHI ET AL., "Quality improvement of synthesised speech in noisy speech analysis-synthesis processing", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, MARYLAND, USA, (198109), vol. 64, no. 9, pages 21 - 30, XP000600521 [A] 1 * page 21 - page 26, column L, paragraph 1 * | [A] - W.M. KUSHNER ET AL., "The effects of subtractive-type speech enhancement/noise reduction algorithms on parameter estimation for improved recognition and coding in high noise environments", ICASSP 89, GLASGOW, (19890523), vol. 1, pages 211 - 214 [A] 1 * page 211 - page 212, column R, paragraph 3 * | [A] - D.G.CHILDERS ET AL., "Co-channel speech separation", ICASSP 87, DALLAS, (19870406), pages 181 - 184 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - D. O'SHAUGHNESSY, "Enhancing speech degraded by additive noise or interfering speakers", IEEE COM. MAGAZINE, NEW YORK, (198902), vol. 27, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/35.17653, pages 46 - 52, XP000099236 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.17653 |