blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0627568

EP0627568 - Fixing and centering press fit element, mainly wheel bolt [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.1998
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kamax-Werke Rudolf Kellermann GmbH & Co. KG
Petershütter Allee 29
37520 Osterode am Harz / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/49]For all designated states
Kamax-Werke Rudolf Kellermann GmbH & Co. KG
Petershütter Allee 29
D-37520 Osterode / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Damm, Klaus Dr.-Ing.
Hoherbergsweg 10
D-35315 Homberg/Ohm / DE
02 / Mages, Walter Dr.-Ing.
Porschestr. 20
D-36304 Alsfeld / DE
03 / Mohr, Andreas Dipl.-Ing.
Hauptstr. 9
D-36326 Antrifttal 3 / DE
[1994/49]
Representative(s)Rehberg, Elmar
Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Postfach 31 62
37021 Göttingen / DE
[2009/51]
Former [1994/49]Rehberg, Elmar, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Kirschberge 22
D-37085 Göttingen / DE
Application number, filing date94108182.027.05.1994
[1994/49]
Priority number, dateDE1993431849404.06.1993         Original published format: DE 4318494
[1994/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0627568
Date:07.12.1994
Language:DE
[1994/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0627568
Date:07.05.1997
Language:DE
[1997/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1994
ClassificationIPC:F16B19/02, F16B35/04
[1994/49]
CPC:
F16B4/004 (EP,US); B60B3/16 (EP,US); F16B35/041 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   FR,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1994/49]
TitleGerman:Presspassverbindungselement, insbesondere Radbolzen[1994/49]
English:Fixing and centering press fit element, mainly wheel bolt[1994/49]
French:Elément de connection et de centrage par insertion à force, en particulier boulon de roue[1994/49]
Examination procedure24.10.1994Examination requested  [1994/51]
29.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.11.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.1996Fee for grant paid
27.12.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB1235143  (TORRE JACK LA [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB399980  (DARDELET THREADLOCK CORP) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1111029  (CHARLES EDWARD STEWART PLACE) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0144503  (BOESNER FRIEDRICH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE3521755  (KELLERMANN FA RUDOLF [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE2143784  (TOKAI COLD FORMING CO LTD) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.