blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0632114

EP0632114 - Thermosetting printing ink composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION
222 Bridge Plaza South
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US
[2000/02]
Former [1995/01]For all designated states
SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION
222 Bridge Plaza South
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rooney, John M.
32 Berkeley Circle
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US
02 / Patel, Narendra M.
Rt. 940, P.O. Box 122
Mount Pocono, PA 18344 / US
03 / Kveglis, Albert A.
6 Buckingham Circle
Pine Brook, NJ 07058 / US
04 / Catena, Robert J.
78 Plenge Drive
Belleville, NJ 07109 / US
05 / Di Leo, Leonard
345 Division Avenue
Belleville, NJ 07109 / US
06 / Avci, Selcuk
38 East 9th Street
Clifton, NJ 07011 / US
[1995/01]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1995/01]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date94108307.330.05.1994
[1995/01]
Priority number, dateUS1993007180202.06.1993         Original published format: US 71802
[1995/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0632114
Date:04.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0632114
Date:23.10.1996
[1996/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0632114
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.1996
ClassificationIPC:C09D11/10, // C08G81/00
[1996/43]
CPC:
C09D11/102 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1995/01]C09D11/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/01]
TitleGerman:Wärmehärtbare Druckfarbenzusammensetzung[1999/34]
English:Thermosetting printing ink composition[1995/01]
French:Composition d'encre d'imprimerie thermodurcissable[1995/01]
Former [1995/01]Heisshärtbare Drucktintenzusammensetzung
Examination procedure14.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
28.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
13.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.1999Fee for grant paid
25.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.05.2000
DK30.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
ES31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
[2004/37]
Former [2003/45]AT30.05.2000
DK30.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
Former [2002/10]AT30.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
Former [2002/02]BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
Former [2001/22]BE31.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH04175345  ;
 [A]JPH03139581  ;
 [DA]EP0066267  (DESOTO INC [US]) [DA] 1* claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0114512  (DOW CORNING [GB]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0473812  (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 92-256532[31], XP002011807 & JPH04175345 A 19920623 (HITACHI CHEM. CO. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 91-218540[30], XP002011808 & JPH03139581 A 19910613 (HITACHI CHEMICAL KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.