EP0628788 - Device for measuring longitudinal profiles of plastic material, in particular tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich Theysohn GmbH Borweg 27 D-32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states FRIEDRICH THEYSOHN GmbH Borweg 27 D-32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäfer, Wolfgang Haydnstrasse 9 D-32584 Löhne / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Uwe Panoramastrasse 3 D-32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a D-40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94108510.2 | 03.06.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | DE19934318423 | 03.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4318423 | [1994/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0628788 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0628788 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628788 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01B17/00 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
G01B17/00 (EP);
B29C48/92 (EP);
B29C2948/92238 (EP);
B29C2948/92447 (EP);
B29C2948/92647 (EP);
B29C2948/92923 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, NL [1997/50] |
Former [1994/50] | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL | Extension states | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Vermessen von langgestreckten Kunststoffprofilen, insbesondere Rohren | [1994/50] | English: | Device for measuring longitudinal profiles of plastic material, in particular tubes | [1994/50] | French: | Dispositif pour mesurer des profilés longitudinaux en matière plastique, en particulier des tubes | [1994/50] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 30.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.04.1998 | GB | 29.04.1998 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/25] | GB | 29.04.1998 | |
FR | 25.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | FR | 25.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2080532 (BALZERS HOCHVAKUUM) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 63 - page 3, line 4; figure 2; claims 1-4 * [Y] 1; | [XY]US4740146 (ANGELBECK PETER [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 4, line 23 - column 7, line 54; figures 1-3 *[Y] 1 |