EP0631184 - Colour photographic recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [1999/05] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Beate, Dr. Johannisberg 16 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
Hagemann, Jörg, Dr. Augustastrasse 7 D-51065 Köln / DE | 03 /
Geiger, Markus, Dr. Sperberstrasse 14 D-40764 Langenfeld / DE | [1994/52] | Application number, filing date | 94108788.4 | 08.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | DE19934320444 | 21.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4320444 | [1994/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631184 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631184 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/392 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
G03C7/39296 (EP,US);
G03C7/39216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/52] | Title | German: | Farbfotografisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [1994/52] | English: | Colour photographic recording material | [1994/52] | French: | Matériau photographique couleur d'enregistrement | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 16.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3632631 (WRIGHT WILLIAM E) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 21 - column 3, line 20 *; | [Y]FR2392000 (SANDOZ SA [CH]) [Y] 1-5 * claims 2,11,14,16 *; | [Y]EP0362604 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * page 3, line 56 - line 57 * * page 12, line 1 - page 16, line 25 * * page 20, line 43 - page 22, line 52; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0373574 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-5 * page 9, line 27 - line 31 *; | [A]JPS61251850 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870402), vol. 11, no. 103, Database accession no. (P - 562)<2550> , & JP61251850 A 19861108 (KONISHIROKU) [A] 5 * abstract * |