EP0636491 - Interlayer for laser ablative imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DeBoer, Charles David, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94109081.3 | 14.06.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | US19930099972 | 30.07.1993 Original published format: US 99972 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636491 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636491 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/24, B41M5/40 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41M5/24 (EP,US);
B41M5/465 (EP,US);
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
Y10S430/145 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/05] | Title | German: | Zwischenschicht für die Laserablativabbildung | [1995/05] | English: | Interlayer for laser ablative imaging | [1995/05] | French: | Couche intermédiaire pour la formation d'image par ablation à laser | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1997
WITHDRAWN Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minata-ku Tokyo 106 / JP Opponent's representative Hansen, Bernd Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [1998/09] | 03.02.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.05.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 07.01.1999 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4973571 (KOIKE NAOMASA [JP], et al)[A] 1; | [DA]US5171650 (ELLIS ERNEST W [US], et al) [DA] 1 |