EP0630946 - Water-soluble fibre reactive azo dyestuffs, process for their preparation and their use as dyestuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.11.1998 [1998/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1997/52] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dannheim, Jörg, Dr. Strubbergstrasse 32 D-60489 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 02 /
Reiher, Uwe, Dr. Sachsenring 8 D-65719 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 03 /
Russ, Werner Hubert, Dr. Wingertstrasse 8a D-65439 Flörsheim/Main / DE | [1994/52] | Application number, filing date | 94109158.9 | 15.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | DE19934320447 | 21.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4320447 | [1994/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0630946 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/08, C09B62/507 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
C07D251/50 (EP,KR);
C09B62/4411 (EP,KR);
C09B62/51 (KR);
C09B62/513 (KR);
C09B62/515 (KR);
D06P1/382 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/52] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche faserreaktive Azofarbstoffe, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1994/52] | English: | Water-soluble fibre reactive azo dyestuffs, process for their preparation and their use as dyestuffs | [1994/52] | French: | Colorants azoiques solubles dans l'eau et réactifs avec des fibres, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme colorants | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2346418 (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 1, line 20 - line 21 * * page 7, line 35 *; | [D]GB1576297 (BASF AG); | [DA]EP0070808 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1-6 * page 13, line 11 * * page 13, line 15 - line 24; examples 157,165 *; | [DA]EP0374758 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * page 8, line 32 - page 10, line 42 * |