EP0638526 - Fire-proof safety glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FR
NL
SE
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | For:CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FR
NL
SE
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | |||
Former [1998/20] | For:CH
LI
DE
DK
ES
FR
NL
SE
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | |||
Former [1995/07] | For:CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
LI
NL
SE
Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brix, Peter, Dr. Sertoriusring 21 D-55126 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Kiefer, Werner, Dr. Jupiterweg 19 D-55126 Mainz / DE | 03 /
Leroux, Roland, Dr. Spielbergstrasse 49a D-55271 Stadecken-Elsheim / DE | [1995/07] | Application number, filing date | 94109227.2 | 15.06.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | DE19934325656 | 30.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4325656 | [1995/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638526 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638526 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/093, E06B5/16 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
C03C3/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1995/07] | Title | German: | Brandschutzsicherheitsglas | [1995/07] | English: | Fire-proof safety glass | [1995/07] | French: | Verre de sécurité coupe-feu | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 03.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3673049 (GIFFEN JAMES W, et al) [A] 1,3 * claim - *; | [Y]US3984252 (KIEFER WERNER) [Y] 1-5 * claim - *; | [A]DE2941215 (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN) [A] 1,3 * claim - *; | [A]GB2067549 (ZEISS STIFTUNG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [D]DE3001944 (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN [DE]); | JPS6042247 [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | JPS61281041 [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | SU1284959 [ ] (GNII STEKLA [SU], et al); | [PA]DE4230607 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]) [PA] 1,2 * the whole document * | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870615), vol. 106, no. 24, Database accession no. 200648m, page 277 [Y] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19721113), vol. 77, no. 20, Database accession no. 129954h, page 221 [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - K.A. KOSTANYAN ET AL, PROM. ARM., USSR, vol. 6, pages 44 - 45 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19850715), vol. 103, no. 2, Database accession no. 10373h, page 261 [Y] 1,3-5 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870518), vol. 106, no. 20, Database accession no. 161428t, page 324 [A] 1,3 * abstract * |