EP0629590 - Process for producing glass preform for optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Shinji, c/o Yokohama Works Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd, 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244 / JP | [1994/51] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94109292.6 | 16.06.1994 | [1994/51] | Priority number, date | JP19930144746 | 16.06.1993 Original published format: JP 14474693 | [1994/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0629590 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0629590 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/014 | [1994/51] | CPC: |
C03B37/0148 (EP,US);
C03B37/012 (KR);
Y02P40/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Glasvorform für optische Fasern | [1994/51] | English: | Process for producing glass preform for optical fiber | [1994/51] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une préforme de verre pour fibres optiques | [1994/51] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 07.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.04.1997 | DE | 24.07.1997 | [2004/35] |
Former [1998/03] | DE | 24.07.1997 | |
FR | 19.09.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH02243531 ; | [XA]JPS61281037 ; | [XY]JPS6379731 ; | [X]JPS63291832 ; | [XA]JPS6060935 ; | [X]JPS57160927 ; | [X]JPS60200835 ; | [X]JPH03247532 ; | [X]JPS6479034 ; | [X]JPS63182232 ; | [X]JPS62158130 ; | [X]EP0367871 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) [X] 1-3,17 * column 10, line 47 - column 11, line 10; figure 4 *; | [XA]JPH0218334 ; | [XA]JPS62297239 ; | [X]JPS58176138 ; | [X]JPS6479033 ; | [X]JPS60264338 ; | [X]JPH01239034 ; | [X]JPS63123830 | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901213), vol. 14, no. 562, Database accession no. (C - 788), & JP02243531 A 19900927 (FUJIKURA LTD.) [X] 1-12,17 * abstract; page 180, middle of upper left-hand side and upper right-hand side to lower left-hand side * [A] 13 [Y] 16 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870508), vol. 11, no. 141, Database accession no. (C - 421), & JP61281037 A 19861211 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 1-3,11,17 * abstract; page 241, lower left-hand side * [A] 14 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880819), vol. 12, no. 306, Database accession no. (C - 522), & JP63079731 A 19880409 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 1-3,15,17 * abstract; page 173 * [Y] 16 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890323), vol. 13, no. 119, Database accession no. (C - 579), & JP63291832 A 19881129 (FUJIKURA LTD.) [X] 1-3,15,17 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850808), vol. 9, no. 192, Database accession no. (C - 296), & JP60060935 A 19850408 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO.LTD.) [X] 1-3,11,14,17 * abstract; table on page 188; figures 1,2 * [A] 13 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830107), vol. 7, no. 3, Database accession no. (C - 143), & JP57160927 A 00000000 (NTT CORP.) [X] 1-3,11,14,17 * abstract; page 198, upper right-hand side * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19830418), vol. 98, no. 16, Database accession no. 131155a, page 297, column R [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860313), vol. 10, no. 63, Database accession no. (C - 332), & JP60200835 A 19851011 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 1-5,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920131), vol. 16, no. 40, Database accession no. (C - 906), & JP03247532 A 19911105 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO.LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890628), vol. 13, no. 283, Database accession no. (C - 612), & JP01079034 A 19890324 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881205), vol. 12, no. 462, Database accession no. (C - 549), & JP63182232 A 19880727 (HITACHI CABLE LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871225), vol. 11, no. 398, Database accession no. (C - 466), & JP62158130 A 19870714 (HITACHI CABLE LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900320), vol. 14, no. 146, Database accession no. (C - 704), & JP02018334 A 19900122 (FUJIKURA LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * [A] 11 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880603), vol. 12, no. 191, Database accession no. (C - 501), & JP62297239 A 19871224 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * [A] 11 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840112), vol. 8, no. 7, Database accession no. (C - 204), & JP58176138 A 19831015 (NTT CORP.) [X] 1,3,17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890628), vol. 13, no. 283, Database accession no. (C - 612), & JP01079033 A 19890324 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860522), vol. 10, no. 139, Database accession no. (C - 348), & JP60264338 A 19851227 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO.LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891219), vol. 13, no. 575, Database accession no. (C - 667), & JP01239034 A 19890925 (FUJIKURA LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881006), vol. 12, no. 378, Database accession no. (C - 534), & JP63123830 A 19880527 (FUJIKURA LTD.) [X] 1-3,17 * abstract * |