EP0634136 - Method and device for processing ECG-signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens-Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna 1 / SE | [1998/47] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohlsson, Thomas Backlöksvägen 53 S-165 77 Hässelby / SE | 02 /
Atarius, Roozbeh Musikantvägen 8 B S-224 68 Lund / SE | 03 /
Sörnmo, Leif Bengt Lidfors väg 15 S-224 65 Lund / SE | [1995/03] | Application number, filing date | 94109315.5 | 16.06.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | SE19930002435 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: SE 9302435 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634136 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634136 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/35 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/03] | A61B5/0472, A61B5/0402 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtung zum Verarbeiten von EKG-Signalen | [1998/18] | English: | Method and device for processing ECG-signals | [1995/03] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour traiter des signaux d'ECG | [1998/23] |
Former [1995/03] | Methode und Vorrichtung zum Prozessieren von EKG-Signalen | ||
Former [1995/03] | Méthode et dispositif pour procéder à des signaux d'ECG | Examination procedure | 07.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.1998 | BE | 18.11.1998 | CH | 18.11.1998 | ES | 18.11.1998 | FR | 18.11.1998 | IT | 18.11.1998 | LI | 18.11.1998 | NL | 18.11.1998 | SE | 18.11.1998 | DK | 18.02.1999 | GB | 16.06.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 18.11.1998 | |
BE | 18.11.1998 | ||
CH | 18.11.1998 | ||
ES | 18.11.1998 | ||
FR | 18.11.1998 | ||
LI | 18.11.1998 | ||
NL | 18.11.1998 | ||
SE | 18.11.1998 | ||
DK | 18.02.1999 | ||
GB | 16.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 18.11.1998 | |
BE | 18.11.1998 | ||
CH | 18.11.1998 | ||
ES | 18.11.1998 | ||
LI | 18.11.1998 | ||
NL | 18.11.1998 | ||
SE | 18.11.1998 | ||
DK | 18.02.1999 | ||
FR | 16.04.1999 | ||
GB | 16.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 18.11.1998 | |
BE | 18.11.1998 | ||
CH | 18.11.1998 | ||
ES | 18.11.1998 | ||
LI | 18.11.1998 | ||
NL | 18.11.1998 | ||
SE | 18.11.1998 | ||
FR | 16.04.1999 | ||
GB | 16.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 18.11.1998 | |
BE | 18.11.1998 | ||
CH | 18.11.1998 | ||
ES | 18.11.1998 | ||
LI | 18.11.1998 | ||
SE | 18.11.1998 | ||
FR | 16.04.1999 | ||
GB | 16.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 18.11.1998 | |
BE | 18.11.1998 | ||
CH | 18.11.1998 | ||
LI | 18.11.1998 | ||
SE | 18.11.1998 | ||
FR | 16.04.1999 | ||
GB | 16.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/07] | AT | 18.11.1998 | |
BE | 18.11.1998 | ||
CH | 18.11.1998 | ||
LI | 18.11.1998 | ||
FR | 16.04.1999 | ||
GB | 16.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | AT | 18.11.1998 | |
BE | 18.11.1998 | ||
CH | 18.11.1998 | ||
LI | 18.11.1998 | ||
FR | 16.04.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 18.11.1998 | |
BE | 18.11.1998 | ||
CH | 18.11.1998 | ||
LI | 18.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 18.11.1998 | |
CH | 18.11.1998 | ||
LI | 18.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | CH | 18.11.1998 | |
LI | 18.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4732158 (SADEH DROR [IL])[A] 1-22; | [A]US4796638 (SASAKI MINORU [JP]) [A] 1-22; | [A]US5020540 (CHAMOUN NASSIB G [US]) [A] 1-22; | [A]US5211178 (KADO HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 | [A] - Steven L. Blumlein et al,, "New technique for detection of changes in QRS morphology of ECG signals", American journal of physiology, (198304), vol. 244, pages 560 - 566 [A] 1-22 |