EP0631037 - Heat exchanger with integrated filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR 8, rue Louis-Lormand La Verrière F-78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gire, Hélène 6 rue d'Alsace F-92600 Asnieres / FR | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | ||
Former [1994/52] | Gamonal, Didier VALEO MANAGEMENT SERVICES, Propriété Industrielle, 2, rue André Boulle, B.P.150 F-94004 Creteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 94109341.1 | 17.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | FR19930007653 | 23.06.1993 Original published format: FR 9307653 | [1994/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631037 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631037 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F01M5/00, F01M1/10, F28D9/00, F28D7/10 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
F28F19/01 (EP,KR,US);
F01M1/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01D29/114 (EP,KR,US);
B01D29/902 (EP,US);
B01D35/18 (EP,KR,US);
F01M11/03 (EP,KR,US);
F01M5/002 (EP,KR,US);
F28D7/106 (EP,KR,US);
F28D9/0018 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1994/52] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher mit integriertem Filter | [1994/52] | English: | Heat exchanger with integrated filter | [1994/52] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur à filtre intégré | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 09.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/44] | Request for further processing for: | 30.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 17.06.1999 | [2001/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB320279 (HEENAN & FROUDE LTD, et al) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 89 - page 2, line 104; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US2730083 (JOHANN KREMSER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1551472 (LANGEHEINE EMIL) [A] 1,7 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 10; figures 8-13 *; | [A]DE1551451 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,9* page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]DE2361515 (BLAU CARL) [X] 1,2,10 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 18; figure 1 * [A] 8; | [A]DE3317008 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO8806228 (HYPECO AB [SE]) [DA] 1,5 * page 8, line 26 - page 10, line 21 * * page 12, line 12 - page 13, line 12 * * page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 19; figures 1A,3A *; | EP0344206 [ ] (METSAFE AB [SE]); | [PX]EP0547950 (LABINAL [FR]) [PX] 1,2,5,10 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 13; figures 1-3 * |