EP0632275 - Support for accelerometers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO AG Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22 60326 Frankfurt / DE | [1997/39] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22 D-60326 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states Mannesmann Kienzle GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 45 D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hautvast, Heinz-Josef, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) An der Kälberweid 17 D-78086 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [1995/01] | Application number, filing date | 94109604.2 | 22.06.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | DE19930009918U | 03.07.1993 Original published format: DE 9309918 U | [1995/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632275 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632275 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/00 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
B60T8/171 (EP);
G01D11/245 (EP);
G01P1/023 (EP);
G01P15/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/01] | Title | German: | Halter für Beschleunigungssensoren | [1995/01] | English: | Support for accelerometers | [1995/01] | French: | Support pour accéléromètres | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5012316 (SILVERMINT EMANUEL H [US]) [A] 1,2* column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 2; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE9113744U (SMT & HYBRID GMBH) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 17; figure 1 * |