EP0631208 - Method and apparatus for forming an image on a recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Chiseki c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94109661.2 | 22.06.1994 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | JP19930150958 | 23.06.1993 Original published format: JP 15095893 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0631208 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0631208 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0631208 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/22, G03G15/08, G03G17/00 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
G03G15/348 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/52] | G03G15/22, G03G15/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bilderzeugung auf einem Aufzeichnungsträger | [1994/52] | English: | Method and apparatus for forming an image on a recording medium | [1994/52] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour produire une image sur un support d'enregistrement | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0522813 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 1-19 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [A] 10-14,19 | Examination | EP0407153 | EP0458579 |