EP0632607 - Automatic laser shut-off with protection against unintentional reconnection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vosskämper, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Fritz-Baer Strasse 5 D-81476 München / DE | [1995/01] | Application number, filing date | 94109662.0 | 22.06.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | DE19934321601 | 29.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4321601 | [1995/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632607 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/08 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
H04B10/0799 (EP);
H04B2210/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/01] | Title | German: | Automatische Laserabschaltung mit Schutz gegen unbeabsichtigte Wiedereinschaltung | [1995/01] | English: | Automatic laser shut-off with protection against unintentional reconnection | [1995/01] | French: | Laser à interruption automatique avec protection contre reconnexion involontaire | [2000/14] |
Former [1995/01] | Laser à interruption automatique avec protection contre réconnexion involontaire | Examination procedure | 19.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/10] | 10.08.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0437162 (IBM) [A] 1-9 * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 14 * * column 10, line 7 - line 15 *; | [A]GB2195508 (STC) [A] 1-9 * page 1, line 85 - line 112 * * page 1, line 119 - line 129 * * page 2, line 3 - line 9 * |