Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.09.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] |
31.05.1997 | Renewal fee | |
28.06.1996 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] |
11.06.1996 | Renewal fee | |
10.11.1995 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] |