EP0688577 - Device for treating atrial tachyarrhythmia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holmström, Nils Päronvägen 4A S-175 49 Järfälla / SE | 02 /
Hagel, Pia Folkungavägen 22 S-191 50 Sollentuna / SE | 03 /
Carlsten, Johan Solrosgatan 15 S-753 24 Uppsala / SE | 04 /
Stroetmann, Brigitte, Dr.rer.nat. Schleifweg 19 D-91080 Uttenreuth / DE | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94109832.9 | 24.06.1994 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688577 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/362, A61N1/39 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
A61N1/3962 (EP,US);
A61N1/39622 (EP,US);
A61N1/36114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Vorhoftachyarrhythmien | [1995/52] | English: | Device for treating atrial tachyarrhythmia | [1995/52] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de tachyarythmie auriculaire | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 22.08.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.09.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5203326 (COLLINS KENNETH A [AU]) [A] 1-3 * column 7, line 41 - column 12, line 36 * * column 19, line 26 - column 24, line 13; figure - *; | [A]EP0532144 (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, column 4, line 32 - page 4, column 6, line 14; figure - *; | [A]US5243980 (MEHRA RAHUL [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 4; figure - *; | [A]EP0565909 (SORIN BIOMEDICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * page 5, column 8, line 17 - page 7, column 11, line 29; figure - * | [AD] - MAX SCHALDACH, Electrotherapy of the Heart, HEIDELBERG, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1992) [AD] 1-3 * page 209, line 1 - page 214, line 10; figure - * | [AD] - TARVER ET AL., "Clinical Experience with a Helical Bipolar Stimulating Lead", PACE, HOUSTON TEXAS, (199210), vol. 15 PII, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1540-8159.1992.tb02933.x, pages 1545 - 1556, XP000672111 [AD] 1,2 * page 1546, line 4 - page 1549, line 47; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1540-8159.1992.tb02933.x |