Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0852121 | Global Dossier | 27.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | EP94109833 | 24.06.1994 | US53493395 | 28.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0688578 | Global Dossier | 10.11.1999 | B1 | EP0688578 | 27.12.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP94109833 | 24.06.1994 | US53493395 | 28.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5658318 | 19.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP94109833 | 24.06.1994 | US53493395 | 28.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69421608T | 09.03.2000 | T2 | DE69421608D1 | 16.12.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP94109833 | 24.06.1994 |