EP0634169 - Quinoline or quinazoline derivatives and their use in the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of osteoporosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/03] | Pharmaceutical composition containing quinoline or quinazoline derivatives | ||
[1999/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi, 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sohda, Takashi 27-20, Higashikanmaki 2-chome Osaka 569 / JP | 02 /
Taketomi, Shigehisa 11-11, Hachizuka 3-chome Ikeda, Osaka 563 / JP | 03 /
Baba, Atsuo 10-32-302, Hama-ashiyacho Ashiya, Hyogo 659 / JP | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94109861.8 | 25.06.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | JP19930158652 | 29.06.1993 Original published format: JP 15865293 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634169 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634169 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/395, A61K31/495, A61K31/47, A61K31/435, A61K31/505 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/4741 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/50 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
C07D215/54 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | Chinoline oder Chinazolin-Derivate und deren Verwendung zur Herstellung eines Medikaments für die Behandlung von Osteoporose | [1999/13] | English: | Quinoline or quinazoline derivatives and their use in the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of osteoporosis | [2000/01] | French: | Dérivés quinolines ou quinazolines et leur utilisation dans la fabrication d'un médicament pour le traitement de l'ostéoporose | [2000/01] |
Former [1995/03] | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung enthaltend Chinoline oder Chinazolin-Derivate | ||
Former [1995/03] | Pharmaceutical composition containing quinoline or quinazoline derivatives | ||
Former [1995/03] | Composition pharmaceutique contenant des dérivés quinalines ou quinozolines | Examination procedure | 14.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2000 | BE | 05.01.2000 | ES | 05.01.2000 | GR | 05.01.2000 | IT | 05.01.2000 | NL | 05.01.2000 | SE | 05.01.2000 | DK | 05.04.2000 | PT | 05.04.2000 | LU | 25.06.2000 | IE | 26.06.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
LU | 25.06.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 26.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4343940 (KREIGHBAUM WILLIAM E, et al) [X] 1,2,26 * "compound 15"; columns 7-8; table 1 *; | [A]EP0403185 (ROBINS CO INC A H [US]) [A] 1-27* claim 1 *; | [PX]EP0567107 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-19,21,22,24-26 * page 2, line 9 - line 26; claims 1,26; tables 9-21 *; | [DE]EP0608870 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [DE] 1-3,7,8,10-26 * claims 1,18-20; tables 2-9 * |