EP0637678 - Assembly system for steam turbine condenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1995/06] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bakran, Velimir Eichhornshöhe 4 D-64668 Rimbach / DE | [1995/06] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/06] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94109880.8 | 27.06.1994 | [1995/06] | Priority number, date | DE19930009854U | 02.07.1993 Original published format: DE 9309854 U | [1995/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0637678 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0637678 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F01K11/02, F01D25/28 | [1995/06] | CPC: |
F01K11/02 (EP);
F28F9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, NL [1995/06] | Title | German: | Montagevorrichtung für Dampfturbinenkondensatoren | [1995/06] | English: | Assembly system for steam turbine condenser | [1995/06] | French: | Système de montage pour condenseur pour turbine à vapeur | [1995/06] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU798330 ; | [A]US1814626 (ALLEN ROBERT C) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [Y]CH461536 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6,8 * column 4, line 60 - column 65; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2109432 (EDF); | [Y]FR2120382 (EDF) [Y] 1-6,8 * page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 18; figure - *; | [A]EP0004392 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0006338 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]US4287718 (DICKEY JIMMY R) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (19810123), vol. 81, no. 42, Database accession no. 81-K9102D, & SU798330 A 19790311 (KHARK TEPLOELEKTROP) [A] 1 * abstract * |