EP0632302 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1998 [1998/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Hiroyuki, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Motoi, Toshihiro, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takaki, Kouichi, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1995/01] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94109958.2 | 28.06.1994 | [1995/01] | Priority number, date | JP19930159472 | 29.06.1993 Original published format: JP 15947293 | [1995/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0632302 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0632302 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, G06K15/12 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
H04N1/1911 (EP,US);
G02B27/0031 (EP,US);
G06K15/1261 (EP,US);
H04N1/047 (EP,US);
H04N1/1135 (EP,US);
H04N1/12 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02439 (EP,US);
H04N2201/03108 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04712 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04729 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04731 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04732 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04734 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04744 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04749 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04756 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04784 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04789 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/49] |
Former [1995/01] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Abbildende Vorrichtung | [1995/01] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [1995/01] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [1995/01] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5105296 (CHO MASAMICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4 * column A; figures 15-19 *; | [Y]EP0412038 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1,4 * page 3, lines 5-39; figures 5-10 *; | [A]US4206348 (DAVY LEE N [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 31-65 * | [A] - D.H.CASLER ET AL., "DEFLECTION SENSOR FOR OPTICAL SCANNERS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (197206), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 5 - 6 |