EP0633253 - Process for production of tris(tribromophenoxy)-s-triazine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kogyo Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 55 Nishishichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states DAI-ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 55 Nishishichijo Higashikubo-cho Shimogyo-ku Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishibori, Setsuo 21-3, Kurozu 2-chome Otsu, Shiga / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Hideto 19 Nishishichijo Higashikubocho Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto / JP | [1995/02] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94110023.2 | 28.06.1994 | [1995/02] | Priority number, date | JP19930168834 | 08.07.1993 Original published format: JP 16883493 | JP19930168835 | 08.07.1993 Original published format: JP 16883593 | [1995/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633253 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0633253 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/34 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
C07D251/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Tris(tribromophenoxy)-s-Triazinen | [1995/02] | English: | Process for production of tris(tribromophenoxy)-s-triazine | [1995/02] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de tris(tribromophénoxy)-s-triazines | [1995/02] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2934525 (FRANK FEKETE) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 30-35 *; | [X]NL6808412 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [X] 1-10 * complete document , in particular examples 9-12 *; | [DA]FR1566675 (SOCIETE D'ETUDES CHIMIQUES POUR L'INDUSTRIE ET L'AGRICULTURE) [DA] 1* complete document *; | [A]US4039538 (KLINKENBERG HERBERT, et al) [A] 1 * complete document *; | [X]US4187377 (KAWAHARA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 11, line 14 - column 12, line 38 * |