EP0692341 - Chuck particularly for machining marble and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FA.PE.MAC.SPA Via F.lli Pinarello 22 31037 LORIA (TREVISO) / IT | [2000/05] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states PEGORARO Ermenegildo, PEGORARO Renato, PEGORARO Sergio trading under the trading style PEGORARO DI PEGORARO E. C. S.n.c. Via Sega, 20 I-31037 Castione di Loria (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pegoraro, Ermenegildo Via Sega 20 31037 Castione di Loria, (Treviso) / IT | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94110080.2 | 29.06.1994 | [1996/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692341 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0692341 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B24B41/04, B23Q1/70 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
B24B41/04 (EP);
B23Q1/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, PT [1996/03] | Title | German: | Spannfutter insbesondere zum Bearbeiten von Marmor und dergleichen | [1996/03] | English: | Chuck particularly for machining marble and the like | [1996/03] | French: | Mandrin en particulier pour l'usinage du marbre et similaire | [1996/03] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.1996 | 30.06.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.1997 | 30.06.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2000 | BE | 15.03.2000 | CH | 15.03.2000 | FR | 15.03.2000 | GR | 15.03.2000 | LI | 15.03.2000 | NL | 15.03.2000 | DE | 16.06.2000 | GB | 29.06.2000 | LU | 29.06.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
GR | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
NL | 15.03.2000 | ||
DE | 16.06.2000 | ||
GB | 29.06.2000 | ||
LU | 29.06.2000 | ||
FR | 11.08.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
GR | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
NL | 15.03.2000 | ||
DE | 16.06.2000 | ||
GB | 29.06.2000 | ||
FR | 11.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
NL | 15.03.2000 | ||
DE | 16.06.2000 | ||
GB | 29.06.2000 | ||
FR | 11.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
DE | 16.06.2000 | ||
GB | 29.06.2000 | ||
FR | 11.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
GB | 29.06.2000 | ||
FR | 11.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
FR | 11.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 15.03.2000 | |
BE | 15.03.2000 | ||
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 15.03.2000 | |
LI | 15.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]NL9535C (E.A. HANSEN) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 90 - page 96; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPS6254667 ; | [A]SU1763159 ; | [Y]DE966306 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 34 - line 77; figure - *; | [A]FR2204991 (BANDO KIKO CO [JP]); | [A]FR2370553 (PROIZV OB TUR [SU]) [A] 1 * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870807), vol. 11, no. 241, Database accession no. (M - 614), & JP62054667 A 19870310 (NIPPEI TOYAMA CORP.) [A] 1,2,13 * abstract * | [A] - SOVIET PATENTS ABSTRACTS, 6, Derwent World Patents Index, (19941117), vol. 93, no. 39, Database accession no. 93-310321, & SU1763159 A 19920923 (KIVOROZHRUDMASH MINING SCI PRODN ASSOC) [A] * abstract * |