Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0635384
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.07.2000 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] |
21.03.2000 |
Opposition rejected |
|
16.12.1999 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
22.09.1999 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
22.02.1999 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
04.11.1998 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
25.09.1998 |
Opposition filed |
published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] |
23.09.1998 |
Examination of admissibility of opposition |
|
24.10.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] |
30.09.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.08.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.06.1997 |
Change - German title |
published on 23.07.1997 [1997/30] |
05.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.05.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.01.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.10.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.08.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.07.1996 |
First examination report |
|
03.07.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.12.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] |
09.12.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] |