Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3487910B | Global Dossier | 19.01.2004 | B2 | JPH0752615 | 28.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9308932 | 19.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0635384 | Global Dossier | 10.12.1997 | B1 | EP0635384 | 25.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9308932 | 19.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE160973T | 15.12.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9308932 | 19.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2127433 | 27.04.2004 | C | CA2127433 | 20.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9308932 | 19.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69407225T | 30.04.1998 | T2 | DE69407225D1 | 22.01.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9308932 | 19.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2111805T | 16.03.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9308932 | 19.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2707923 | 27.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9308932 | 19.07.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5450887 | 19.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9308932 | 19.07.1993 |