EP0634383 - Process for the addition of HF to halogenated alkenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franz, Raimund, Dr. Insterburger Strasse 16 D-65779 Kelkheim / DE | 02 /
Siegemund, Günter, Dr. Frankfurter Strasse 21 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 94110535.5 | 06.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | DE19934323264 | 12.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4323264 | DE19934339539 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4339539 | [1995/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634383 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634383 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/087, C07C19/08, C07C19/12 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
C07C17/087 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/087, C07C19/08 (US,EP);
C07C17/087, C07C19/12 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Addition von HF an halogenierte Alkene | [1995/03] | English: | Process for the addition of HF to halogenated alkenes | [1995/03] | French: | Procédé d'addition de HF à des alkènes halogénés | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8600294 (UNIV ANGERS [FR]) [A] 1* claim - * | [DA] - N. YONEDA ET AL., "Melamine-Hydrogen Fluoride Solution. A Hihgly Effective And Convenient Hydrofluorination Reagent Of Alkenes.", CHEMISTRY LETTERS., TOKYO JP, (1983), pages 1135 - 1136 [DA] 1 * table 1 * |