EP0637004 - Method for recording usage data of card operated devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/05] | Method and apparatus for recording usage data of card operated devices | ||
[1997/38] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Opposition rejected | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Stationsplein 7 9726 AE Groningen / NL | [1998/49] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V. P.O. Box 95321 NL-2509 CH The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van de Pavert, Hendricus Johannes Wilhelmus Maria Kwikstaartveld 12 NL-2727 BV Zoetermeer / NL | [1995/05] | Application number, filing date | 94110728.6 | 11.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | NL19930001271 | 20.07.1993 Original published format: NL 9301271 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0637004 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0637004 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G07F9/02, G07F7/02 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06Q20/229 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/363 (EP);
G06Q20/4093 (EP);
G06Q20/4097 (EP);
G07F7/0826 (EP);
G07F7/0866 (EP);
G07F9/026 (EP);
G07F9/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufzeichnung von Gebrauchsdaten von kartenbetätigten Vorrichtungen | [1997/38] | English: | Method for recording usage data of card operated devices | [1997/38] | French: | Méthode pour l'enregistrement de données d'utilisation de dispositifs actionnés par carte | [1997/38] |
Former [1995/05] | Verfahren und Gerät zur Aufzeichnung von Gebrauchsdaten von kartenbetätigten Vorrichtungen | ||
Former [1995/05] | Method and apparatus for recording usage data of card operated devices | ||
Former [1995/05] | Méthode et appareil pour l'enregistrement de données d'utilisation de dispositifs actionnés par carte | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/18: Teilanmeldung 97200502.9 eingereicht am 21/02/97 | EPB 1997/18: Divisional application 97200502.9 filed on 21/02/97 | EPB 1997/18: Demande divisionnaire 97200502.9 déposée le 21/02/97 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 14.07.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97200502.9 / EP0775991 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.1998
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.1998
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE | 27.07.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.11.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.09.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.10.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.11.2001 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0185365 (GNT AUTOMATIC AS) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3543067 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2172720 (MARS INC) [A] 1-3,5,8,11,13-15 * abstract *; | [AD]DE4103415 (LANGE FRANK [DE]) | [AD] - WOLFGANG HEBERLE ET.AL., "öffentliches Kartentelefon für Wert- und Kreditkarten", NTZ NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, BERLIN DE, vol. 39, no. 11, pages 754 - 759 [AD] 1-7,11,13-15 * the whole document * | [A] - WERNER STAMMINGER, "öKOM-DB - das Abrechnungssystem für Kartentelefone des DB.", SIGNAL + DRAHT, DARMSTADT DE, vol. 85, no. 3, pages 61 - 64 [A] 1-15 * Punkt 4 : Gebührenerfassung und Gebührenabrechnung im öKart-Zug-System.; page 63 - page 64 * | Examination | US4529870 | EP0223213 | - L'Echo des RECHERCHES, N° 134, 1988. pp 15-24, "Le paiement électronique", P. Rémery, J.-C. Pailles, F. lay |