blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0634642

EP0634642 - Apparatus and method for optically measuring concentrations of components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD.
57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/03]For all designated states
KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD.
57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Xu, Kexin, c/o Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co., Ltd.
57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP
02 / Yamasaki, Yutaka, c/o Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co, Ltd
57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP
03 / Uenoyama, Harumi, c/o Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co, Ltd
57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP
04 / Sakura, Takeshi, c/o Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co, Ltd.
57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP
[1995/03]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]Dallmeyer, Georg, et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [1995/03]Dallmeyer, Georg, et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
D-50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date94110777.312.07.1994
[1995/03]
Priority number, dateJP1993017415614.07.1993         Original published format: JP 17415693
[1995/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0634642
Date:18.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0634642
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.1994
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/03, G01N21/59
[1995/03]
CPC:
G01N21/0303 (EP,US); G01N21/31 (EP,US); G01J3/42 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3129 (EP,US); G01N21/39 (EP,US); G01N21/59 (EP,US);
G01N2201/066 (EP,US); G01N2201/0668 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1995/03]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Methode zur optischen Bestimmung von Konzentrationen[1995/03]
English:Apparatus and method for optically measuring concentrations of components[1995/03]
French:Appareil et méthode pour la détermination de concentrations par moyens optiques[1995/03]
Examination procedure24.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/21]
29.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.1999Fee for grant paid
26.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH19.01.2000
IT19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2000/52]CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH25.04.2000
LI25.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2193313  (GUIDED WAVE INC) [A] 1-5,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - R.J.FIDDIK ET AL., "A variable-pathlength optical cell with no moving parts", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, BRISTOL GB, (1988), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1088/0022-3735/21/11/006, pages 1033 - 1037, XP000026873 [A] 1-3,11 * page 1033; figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3735/21/11/006
 [A]  - T.HIRSCHFELD, "Lens and Wedge Absorption Cells for FT-IR Spectroscopy", APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, BALTIMORE US, (1985), vol. 39, no. 3, pages 426 - 430 [A] 1-3,11 * abstract * * page 430, column R; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.