EP0634657 - Chemical analysis film chip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seshimoto, Osamu c/o Fuji Photo Co., Ltd., 3-11-46 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Abe, Yoshihiko c/o Fuji Photo Co., Ltd., 3-11-46 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Fujisaki, Yasushi c/o Fuji Photo Co., Ltd., 3-11-46 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94110801.1 | 12.07.1994 | [1995/03] | Priority number, date | JP19930177054 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17705493 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0634657 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0634657 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52, // G01N35/00 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
G01N35/00029 (EP,US);
G01N33/525 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00089 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00108 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/112499 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/03] | Title | German: | Film-Clips für die chemische Analyse | [1995/03] | English: | Chemical analysis film chip | [1995/03] | French: | Film-puce pour l'analyse chimique | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/09] | 02.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0064691 (MILES LAB [US]) [A] 1-26 * column W *; | [DX]EP0162302 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-6,8,9,11-16,18,19,21-25 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 21 *; | [X]EP0525550 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-26 * page 4, line 43 - page 5, line 25 *; | [PX]EP0555654 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3,11-13,21-23* column 6, line 6 - line 13 * |