EP0635323 - Nozzle for continuous caster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eckert, C. Edward 260 Lynn Ann Drive New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | [1995/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94110833.4 | 12.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | US19930091720 | 13.07.1993 Original published format: US 91720 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635323 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635323 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06, B22D41/54 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
B22D11/0642 (EP,US);
B22D41/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/04] | Title | German: | Düse für Stranggiessanlage | [1995/04] | English: | Nozzle for continuous caster | [1995/04] | French: | Tuyère pour moulage continu | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Request for further processing for: | 22.05.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 03.09.1999 | [2000/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4526223 (AI DANIEL K [US], et al); | [DA]US3799410 (BLOSSEY R, et al); | [A]EP0106823 (FRYKENDAHL BJOERN) [A] 1-10 * figure -; claim 2 *; | [A]FR1294250 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0133896 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0134980 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2173582 (ASHLAND CHEMICAL LTD) [A] 6-10 * page 2, line 13 - page 2, line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS5813463 ; | [A]EP0373354 (RADEX HERAKLITH [AT]) [A] 6-10 * claim 19 *; | [A]EP0106739 (PRODUITS REFRACTAIRES [FR]) [A] 6-10 * claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830413), vol. 7, no. 89, Database accession no. (M - 207)<1234> , & JP58013463 A 19830125 (KIYOUWA CHIYUUZOUSHIYO K.K.) [A] 6-10 * abstract * | [A] - PETER ARTELT, Feuerfeststoffe für den Stranggiessbereich, DüSSELDORF, STAHL UND EISEN 112 (1992) 15 APRIL, NO.4, SEITE 111-114 [A] 6-10 * page 111, column R, paragraph 2 * |