blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0643430

EP0643430 - Cathode material for lithium secondary battery and method for producing lithiated nickel dioxide and lithium secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP
Former [1995/11]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
Kitahama 4-chome 5-33
Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Satoh, Tomoari
460-61, Kamihirooka
Tsukuba-shi / JP
02 / Nakane, Kenji
Furenzu Douhou 304, 13-3, Ninomiya 2-chome
Tsukuba-shi / JP
03 / Nishida, Yasunori
Furenzu Douhou 404, 13-3, Ninomiya 2-chome
Tsukuba-shi / JP
[1995/11]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1995/11]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date94110989.414.07.1994
[1995/11]
Priority number, dateJP1993017519815.07.1993         Original published format: JP 17519893
JP1993033024227.12.1993         Original published format: JP 33024293
JP1994009837912.05.1994         Original published format: JP 9837994
[1995/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0643430
Date:15.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0643430
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.1995
ClassificationIPC:H01M4/52, H01M4/48
[1995/11]
CPC:
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US); H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US); C01G53/42 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/30 (EP,KR,US); C01P2002/52 (EP,KR,US); C01P2004/61 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,KR,US); C01P2006/40 (EP,KR,US); H01M2300/0025 (KR);
H01M2300/0065 (KR); Y02E60/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/11]
TitleGerman:Kathodenmaterial für sekundäre Lithiumbatterien und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Lithium/Nickeloxid und sekundären Lithiumbatterien[1995/11]
English:Cathode material for lithium secondary battery and method for producing lithiated nickel dioxide and lithium secondary battery[1995/11]
French:Matériaux cathodique pour batterie secondaire à lithium et méthode pour la production d'oxyde de nickel lithié et batterie secondaire au lithium[1999/21]
Former [1995/11]Matériaux cathodique pour batterie secondaires à lithium et méthode pour la production d'oxyde de nickel lithié et batterie secondaire au lithium
Examination procedure27.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/38]
04.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1999Fee for grant paid
28.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.10.2000    ADMISSIBLE
H.C. STARCK GmbH & Co. KG
Im Schleeke 78-91
D-38642 GOSLAR / DE
Opponent's representative
Drope, Rüdiger
c/o Bayer AG
Konzernbereich RP
Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/49]
Opponent(s)01  17.10.2000    ADMISSIBLE
H.C. STARCK GmbH & Co. KG
Im Schleeke 78-91
D-38642 GOSLAR / DE
Opponent's representative
Drope, Rüdiger, Dr.
c/o Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
07.12.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.06.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.12.2002Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.01.2003Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
09.02.2003Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4567031  (RILEY BRIAN [US]) [XY] 1,2,12 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 51; claims 1-4,6-10,12-16 * [Y] 3-11;
 [Y]EP0345707  (SAFT SA [FR]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8-12 * the whole document *;
 [D]JPH0240861  (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES);
 [A]EP0468942  (CANADA MAJESTY IN RIGHT OF [CA]);
 [PY]EP0556555  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 3,4,8-12 * the whole document *;
 [PY]EP0573040  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 9 * claims 1-15 *;
 [PX]US5316875  (MURAI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2,12 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 30; claim 2; tables 1,2 *;
 [DXY]  - J. R. DAHN ET AL., "STRUCTURE AND ELECTROCHEMISTRY OF LI1+_NIO2 AND A NEW LI2NIO2 PHASE WITH THE NI(OH)2 STRUCTURE", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH-HOLLAND, (1990), vol. 44, pages 87 - 97, XP000214469 [DXY] 1,2,12 * the whole document * [Y] 3-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-2738(90)90049-W
ExaminationJPH05135760
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.