EP0654551 - Open-end spinning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO. Blumenberger Strasse 143-145 41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO. Blumenberger Strasse 143-145 D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wassenhoven, Heinz-Georg Hindenburgstrasse 117 D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1995/21] | Application number, filing date | 94111032.2 | 15.07.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | DE19934334485 | 09.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4334485 | [1995/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0654551 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0654551 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654551 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D01H4/08 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
D01H4/38 (EP,US);
D01H4/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1995/21] | Title | German: | Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung | [1995/21] | English: | Open-end spinning device | [1995/21] | French: | Métier à filer à bout libre | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 08.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2195713 (SHINO MASAKAZU [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 6, line 38 - page 7, line 18; figure 5 *; | [A]DE3705479 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |