blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0642770

EP0642770 - Angled or straight hand-piece with a releasable chuck device for a tool, in particular for medical purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2000
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.09.2000 [2000/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KALTENBACH & VOIGT GMBH & CO
Bismarckring 39
88400 Biberach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
KALTENBACH & VOIGT GMBH & CO.
Bismarckring 39
88400 Biberach / DE
Former [1995/11]For all designated states
KALTENBACH & VOIGT GMBH & CO.
Bismarckring 39
D-88400 Biberach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Logé, Hans
Ranzweg 23
D-88400 Biberach / DE
[1995/11]
Representative(s)Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/11]Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date94111062.915.07.1994
[1995/11]
Priority number, dateDE1993432566530.07.1993         Original published format: DE 4325665
DE1994440857414.03.1994         Original published format: DE 4408574
[1995/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0642770
Date:15.03.1995
Language:DE
[1995/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0642770
Date:12.07.1995
Language:DE
[1995/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0642770
Date:06.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1995
ClassificationIPC:A61C1/14, B23B31/107
[1995/28]
CPC:
A61C1/141 (EP,US); A61C1/186 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1995/11]A61C1/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [1995/11]
TitleGerman:Winkelförmiges oder gerades Handstück mit einer lösbaren Spannvorrichtung für ein Werkzeug, insbesondere für medizinische Zwecke[1995/11]
English:Angled or straight hand-piece with a releasable chuck device for a tool, in particular for medical purposes[1995/11]
French:Pièce à main contre-angle ou droite avec dispositif de serrage détachable pour un outil, en particulier pour des fins médicales[1995/11]
Examination procedure05.10.1995Examination requested  [1995/49]
28.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.1999Fee for grant paid
01.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99105669.8  / EP0925762
Opposition(s)07.07.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3442386  (MICRO MEGA SA [FR]) [AD] 1-5* figure - *;
 [AD]EP0305357  (BUERMOOS DENTALWERK [AT]) [AD] 1-5 * figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.