EP0625429 - Heat transfer sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON INSATSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-To / JP | [1994/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshima, Katsuyuki, c/o Dai Nippon Insatsu K. K. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-Chome, Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | 02 /
Ando, Jitsuhiko, c/o Dai Nippon Insatsu K. K. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-Chome, Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | 03 /
Torii, Masanori, c/o Dai Nippon Insatsu K. K. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-Chome, Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Rucker, Ernst Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Rucker, Ernst, Dr. Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111077.7 | 13.07.1990 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | JP19890180471 | 14.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18047189 | JP19890180472 | 14.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18047289 | JP19890180473 | 14.07.1989 Original published format: JP 18047389 | JP19890241929 | 20.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24192989 | JP19890325870 | 18.12.1989 Original published format: JP 32587089 | JP19900140011 | 31.05.1990 Original published format: JP 14001190 | [1994/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625429 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625429 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/38, B41M5/40 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41M5/38228 (EP,US);
B41M5/405 (EP,US);
B41M5/443 (EP,US);
B41M7/0027 (EP,US);
B41M7/009 (EP,US);
B41M5/423 (EP,US);
B41M5/46 (EP,US);
B41M7/0072 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24876 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31768 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31801 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/47] | Title | German: | Thermische Übertragungsschicht | [1994/47] | English: | Heat transfer sheet | [1994/47] | French: | Feuille pour transfert thermique | [1994/47] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 07.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90910943.1 / EP0487727 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.12.1998 | CH | 16.12.1998 | ES | 16.12.1998 | IT | 16.12.1998 | LI | 16.12.1998 | NL | 16.12.1998 | DK | 16.03.1999 | SE | 16.03.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | BE | 16.12.1998 | |
CH | 16.12.1998 | ||
ES | 16.12.1998 | ||
LI | 16.12.1998 | ||
NL | 16.12.1998 | ||
DK | 16.03.1999 | ||
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 16.12.1998 | |
CH | 16.12.1998 | ||
ES | 16.12.1998 | ||
LI | 16.12.1998 | ||
NL | 16.12.1998 | ||
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 16.12.1998 | |
CH | 16.12.1998 | ||
ES | 16.12.1998 | ||
LI | 16.12.1998 | ||
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | BE | 16.12.1998 | |
CH | 16.12.1998 | ||
LI | 16.12.1998 | ||
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 16.12.1998 | |
CH | 16.12.1998 | ||
LI | 16.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 16.12.1998 | |
CH | 22.03.1999 | ||
LI | 22.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 16.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4704310 (TIGHE LAURENCE E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 60 *; | [A]JPS6458590 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890612), vol. 13, no. 252, Database accession no. (M - 836)<3600>, & JP01058590 A 19890306 (DAI NIPPON PRINTING COMPANY LIMITED) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |