EP0638939 - Solar cell containing low melting point glass layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wada, Takahiro 2-36-3, Amonogahara Katano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Mitsusuke 2-8-5, Kuzuhaoka Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 03 /
Nishitani, Mikihiko 2-16-5, Gakuen Midorigaoka Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP | 04 /
Terauchi, Masaharu Villahamoni 203, 1-8-26, Shiba-machi, Saidaiji Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP | 05 /
Negami, Takayuki 6-6-107, Myoukenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | 06 /
Kohara, Naoki Takatsukiryo 315, Matsushita Denki, 7-1 Miyano-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/07] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111166.8 | 18.07.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | JP19930177882 | 19.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17788293 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0638939 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0638939 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0216, H01L31/072 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
H01L31/0749 (EP,US);
H01L31/02167 (EP,US);
H01L31/0392 (EP,US);
H01L31/03925 (EP,US);
H01L31/0725 (EP,US);
Y02E10/541 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/07] | Title | German: | Sonnenzelle mit einer niedrigschmelzenden Glasschicht | [1995/07] | English: | Solar cell containing low melting point glass layer | [1995/07] | French: | Cellule solaire comportant une couche de verre à bas point de fusion | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 11.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/24] | 18.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPS53138287 ; | [Y]JPS59169955 ; | [XA]US4239553 (BARNETT ALLEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 35 - line 61 * * column 5, line 43 - line 60 * [A] 2,6-9,11-13; | [A]US3653970 (ILES PETER ALBERT) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - line 26 * * column 5, line 3 - line 18 * * claim 1 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790129), vol. 003, no. 010, Database accession no. (E - 087), & JP53138287 A 19781202 (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE & TECHNOL) [X] 1,2,5,12 * abstract * [A] 3,4,6,8-11,13 [Y] 7 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850129), vol. 009, no. 021, Database accession no. (C - 263), & JP59169955 A 19840926 (MITSUBISHI KINZOKU KK) [Y] 7 * abstract * | [A] - STOLT L ET AL, "ZnO/CdS/CuInSe/sub 2/ thin-film solar cells with improved performance", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, 8 FEB. 1993, USA, ISSN 0003-6951, vol. 62, no. 6, pages 597 - 599, XP000336665 [A] 1,2,10-13 * abstract * * page 597 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.108867 |