EP0635332 - Tool head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oesterle, Hermann Talstrasse 21 72202 Nagold / DE | For all designated states Löb, Klaus-Dieter Nagoldtalstrasse 1 D-72224 Ebhausen-Ebershardt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Oesterle, Hermann Talstrasse 21 D-72202 Nagold / DE | ||
For all designated states Löb, Klaus-Dieter Nagoldtalstrasse 1 D-72224 Ebhausen-Ebershardt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Rainer, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Grosse, Rainer, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1995/04] | Grosse, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Maybachstrasse 6A D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111457.1 | 22.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | DE19934324952 | 24.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4324952 | [1995/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635332 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635332 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/00 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
B23Q1/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/04] | Title | German: | Werkzeugkopf | [1995/04] | English: | Tool head | [1995/04] | French: | Tête d'outil | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.02.1997 | GB | 12.02.1997 | SE | 12.05.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [1998/11] | GB | 12.02.1997 | |
SE | 12.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | GB | 12.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2946244 (MAYNARD HARLAN JAMES [US]); | [X]US3028771 (WILLIAM BUNNELL) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 60; figure 1 *; | [X]US3609931 (VOORHIES DONALD A) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2168627 (KEETON SONS); | [A]EP0340026 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) |