EP0635830 - Method and apparatus for recording and reproducing digital data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizushima, Tetsuya 1-B21-504, Otokoyama Yumioka Yawata-shi, Kyoto-fu, 614 / JP | 02 /
Iketani, Akira 2-4-28, Nishitsutsumi Hondori Higashi Higashi-osaka-shi, Osaka-fu, 577 / JP | 03 /
Juri, Tatsuro 1-5-8-2804, Tomobuchi-cho, Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu, 534 / JP | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111472.0 | 22.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | JP19930182584 | 23.07.1993 Original published format: JP 18258493 | JP19940120183 | 01.06.1994 Original published format: JP 12018394 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0635830 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0635830 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | [1996/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635830 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/14, G11B20/12, G11B27/30 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
G11B20/1209 (EP,US);
G11B20/1208 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/3036 (EP,US);
G11B27/3063 (EP,US);
H04N5/9208 (EP,US);
H04N5/926 (EP,US);
H04N9/8244 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/04] | G11B20/14, G11B20/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme und Wiedergabe digitaler Daten | [1995/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for recording and reproducing digital data | [1995/04] | French: | Méthode et appareil d'enregistrement et reproduction de données digitales | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0600467 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,3,4,7,9,10 * column 4, line 44 - line 50 * * column 12, line 56 - column 13, line 1 *; | [XP]EP0553817 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-5,7-11 * column 8, line 45 - line 54 * * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 38; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0421871 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5,7,11 * page 6, line 9 - line 15 * | [A] - LIEBHOLD M ET AL, "TOWARD AN OPEN ENVIRONMENT FOR DIGITAL VIDEO", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, (19910401), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 103 - 112, XP000228793 [A] 1,5,7,11 * page 106, column R, line 36 - page 107, column L, line 42 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/103085.103095 | Examination | EP0603808 |