EP0636403 - Cellulose acetate hemodialysis membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha No.2-8, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha No.2-8, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uenishi, Tohru, c/o Toyo Boseki K.K. Iwakuni Membrane Plant, 1-1, Nadamachi Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Isamu c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res.Inst. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Kazutake, c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res. Ins. 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | 04 /
Sato, Hideo c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res.Inst. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | 05 /
Shiota, Yasuhiro c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res.Inst. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | 06 /
Sakurai, Hidehiko, c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res. Ins. 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | 07 /
Watanuki, Seiji, c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res. Ins. 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | 08 /
Suzuki, Mitsuru c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res.Inst. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | [1995/24] |
Former [1995/05] | 01 /
Uenishi, Tohru, c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res. Ins. 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | ||
02 /
Yamamoto, Isamu c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res.Inst. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | |||
03 /
Okamoto, Kazutake, c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res. Ins. 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | |||
04 /
Sato, Hideo c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res.Inst. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | |||
05 /
Shiota, Yasuhiro c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res.Inst. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | |||
06 /
Sakurai, Hidehiko, c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res. Ins. 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | |||
07 /
Watanuki, Seiji, c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res. Ins. 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | |||
08 /
Suzuki, Mitsuru c/o Toyo Boseki K.K., Res.Inst. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-02 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1995/05] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111598.2 | 26.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | JP19930186336 | 28.07.1993 Original published format: JP 18633693 | JP19930200851 | 12.08.1993 Original published format: JP 20085193 | JP19930206013 | 20.08.1993 Original published format: JP 20601393 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0636403 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0636403 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/16, B01D69/08, B01D67/00, A61M1/16 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
B01D71/16 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/05] | Title | German: | Hämodialysemembran aus Celluloseacetat | [1995/05] | English: | Cellulose acetate hemodialysis membrane | [1995/05] | French: | Membrane d'hémodialyse en acétate de cellulose | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 04.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/37] | 29.04.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JPH05228208 ; | [XY]JPS5742740 ; | [XY]JPS5742918 ; | [X]DE2816086 (SARTORIUS GMBH) [X] 1,4-7 * example 2; claims 1,7 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 6 *; | [X]DE2820265 (KERNENERGIEVERWERT GES FUER) [X] 1,4-7 * examples * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 40, Database accession no. 93-316651, & JPH05228208 A 19930907 (TOYOBO) [PX] 1-5,7-10,12-14 * abstract * | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 16, Database accession no. 82-31742E, & JPS5742740 A 19820310 (MITSUBISHI RAYON) [X] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * [Y] 6,11,14,17-19 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 16, Database accession no. 82-31802e, & JPS5742918 A 19820310 (MITSUBISHI RAYON) [X] 1-5,7-10,12,13,15,16 * abstract * [Y] 6,11,14,17-19 |