EP0648595 - Method for manufacturing a flocked profile with reduced squeaking noises [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METZELER Automotive Profiles GmbH Bregenzer Strasse 133 D-88131 Lindau / DE | [1995/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glagow, Klaus Halbinselstrasse 42 D-88142 Wasserburg / DE | 02 /
Kranz, Jürgen Kirchstrasse 2 D-88131 Lindau/Bodensee / DE | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Seibert, Hannelore Seibert Michelis Preissner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Tattenbachstrasse 9 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Seibert, Hannelore Seibert Michelis Preissner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111794.7 | 28.07.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | DE19934326954 | 11.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4326954 | [1995/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0648595 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0648595 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29D31/00, B60J10/04, B29C59/00, B29C67/00, D06C9/00 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
B05D1/16 (EP);
B29C67/0044 (EP);
B29D24/00 (EP);
B29L2031/42 (EP);
B29L2031/765 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/16] | B29D31/00, B60J10/04, B29C59/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines beflockten Profiles mit verminderten Quietschgeräuschen | [1995/16] | English: | Method for manufacturing a flocked profile with reduced squeaking noises | [1995/16] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un profil floqué avec un grincement réduit | [1995/16] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 01.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/24] | 17.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.09.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3320649 (J. NAIMER) [X] 1 * column 3, line 12 - line 17; figure 6 * [Y] 2; | [Y]DE1209725 (H.J. DIETSCH) [Y] 2 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE3624343 (EUGEN GUTMANN GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1,2 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4024003 (BUHLER HUGO) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE3100757 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W) [A] * page 8, line 11 - line 12; figure - *; | [PA]JPH05213062 (GUNZE LTD;OTHERS: 01) [PA] * figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE3331124 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W) [A] * figure 5 *; | [A]EP0429299 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD) [A] * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5078158 (LEMON J ROBERT ET AL) [A] * figures 1,2 * |