EP0647810 - Screw element with sealing for making a tight threaded connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.1997 [1997/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anton Hummel Verwaltungs-GmbH Mozartstrasse 2 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states Anton Hummel Verwaltungs-GmbH Mozartstrasse 2 D-79183 Waldkirch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehring, Peter Eichhof 11 D-79263 Simonswald / DE | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Hans, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Hans Schmitt, Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Maucher, Dipl.-Ing. RA H. Börjes-Pestalozza, Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94111854.9 | 29.07.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | DE19934325700 | 30.07.1993 Original published format: DE 4325700 | [1995/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0647810 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16L15/06 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
F16L15/001 (EP);
F16L15/006 (EP);
F16L15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/15] | Title | German: | Schraubteil mit Dichtung zur Herstellung einer dichten Gewindeverbindung | [1995/15] | English: | Screw element with sealing for making a tight threaded connection | [1995/15] | French: | Elément à vis avec garniture pour produire une connexion filetée étanche | [1995/15] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 01.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/31] | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9204534U (WEISS WERKZEUG- UND MASCHINENBAU) [X] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0022293 (BAUMGARTNER) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [DA]DE2230740 (SEISLER & CO) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DA]DE7420596U (KLEIN) [DA] * the whole document * |