EP0640391 - Honeycombcatalyst for the oxidation of hydrocarbons and halogenated hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRIDELTA GmbH Industriegelände D-07629 Hermsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states Tridelta GmbH Industriegelände D-07629 Hermsdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winterstein, Georg, Dr. Birkenlinie 22 D-07639 Bad Klosterlausnitz / DE | 02 /
Burckhardt, Wolfgang, Dr. Lieselotte-Herrmann-Strasse 42 D-07747 Jena / DE | [1995/09] | Application number, filing date | 94112111.3 | 03.08.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | DE19934326938 | 11.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4326938 | [1995/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0640391 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0640391 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/00, B01J23/00, B01D53/72, B01D53/70 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
C04B35/16 (EP);
B01D53/8662 (EP);
B01D53/8668 (EP);
B01J23/002 (EP);
B01J35/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/09] | Title | German: | Wabenförmiger keramischer Katalysator zur Oxidation von Kohlenwasserstoffen und halogenierten Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1995/09] | English: | Honeycombcatalyst for the oxidation of hydrocarbons and halogenated hydrocarbons | [1995/09] | French: | Catalyseur en nid d'abeille pour l'oxydation d'hydrocarbures et d'hydrocarbures halogènés | [1995/09] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 28.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/50] | 20.07.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0197644 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [A]EP0212515 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE]); | [A]WO8800093 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | [A]DE3811588 (KOCH CHRISTIAN [DE]) |