EP0639610 - Process for painting of plastics, painted plastics and use of suitable adhesion agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sirinyan, Kirkor, Dr. Humperdinckstrasse 12 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Petzoldt, Joachim, Dr. Alfred-Delp-Strasse 4 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 03 /
Müller, Hanns Peter, Dr. Hollweg 20 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | [1995/08] | Application number, filing date | 94112116.2 | 03.08.1994 | [1995/08] | Priority number, date | DE19934327468 | 16.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4327468 | [1995/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639610 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, // (C09D175/04, 123:28) | [1995/08] | CPC: |
C09D123/28 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/28 (KR);
C08J7/0427 (EP);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,KR);
C08J2323/06 (KR);
C08J2323/12 (KR);
C08J2475/00 (EP);
C08J2475/04 (KR);
C08L2666/34 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D175/04, C08L23/26 (EP);
C09D175/04, C08L2666/34 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Lackierung von Kunststoffen, lackierte Kunststoffe und die Verwendung von hierzu geeigneten Haftvermittlern | [1995/08] | English: | Process for painting of plastics, painted plastics and use of suitable adhesion agents | [1995/08] | French: | Procédé pour peindre de matières plastiques, matières plastiques peintes et utilisation d'agents d'adhésion appropriés | [1995/08] | File destroyed: | 05.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.02.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0189274 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,6 * claims 1-3,5 * * page 4, line 19 - line 35 * * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 2 *; | [A]JPS573863 ; | [A]JPH01256549 ; | [X]DD131091 (CHEMOPETROL) [X] 1 * claim - * * page 4, paragraph 4 *; | [A]JPS54153831 ; | [DA]WO9012056 (PPG IND DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * claim 8 * * page 6, line 8 - line 18 *; | [A]EP0478277 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0430002 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * claims 1,3,6 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 82-12872E[07], & JPS573863 A 19820109 (NIPPON ZEON KK.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 89-344234[47], & JPH01256549 A 19891013 (CEMEDINE CO. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 80-04306C[03], & JPS54153831 A 19791204 (OSAKA SODA KK.) [A] 1 * abstract * |