EP0639626 - Radiation and peroxide curable emulsified coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRAY VALLEY SA Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states CRAY VALLEY SA Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states CRAY VALLEY SA Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boeckeler, Rudolph Henry 1974 Maple Court Grafton, Wisconsin 53024 / US | 02 /
Eslinger, Delano Ray 1632 Terry Dale Drive West Bend, Wisconsin 53095 / US | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/08] | Dubost, Thierry Pierre Cray Valley SA, BP 22 F-60550 Verneuil en Halatte / FR | Application number, filing date | 94112303.6 | 04.08.1994 | [1995/08] | Priority number, date | US19930107521 | 17.08.1993 Original published format: US 107521 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639626 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639626 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/06, C09D4/00 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
C09D4/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F216/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/08] | Title | German: | Durch Strahlen und Peroxid härtbarer emulgierte Überzüge | [1995/08] | English: | Radiation and peroxide curable emulsified coatings | [1995/08] | French: | Revêtements émulsionnés durcissables au péroxide et aux radiations | [1998/38] |
Former [1995/08] | Revêtements émulsionnés durcissable au péroxide et aux radiations | Examination procedure | 11.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02199102 ; | [XY]EP0210158 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 1-7,9-18 * column 9, line 36 - line 45; example -; claim - * [Y] 1-18 | [Y] - "PHOTOCURABLE EMULSION CONTAIN HYDROPHILIC UNSATURATED COMPOUND ...", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 37, Database accession no. 90-280322, & JPH02199102 A 19900807 (DAINIPPON INK CHEM K.K.) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * |