Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0754628 | Global Dossier | 28.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21799593 | 09.08.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0661419 | Global Dossier | 04.11.1998 | B1 | EP0661419 | 05.07.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP21799593 | 09.08.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69414358T | 25.03.1999 | T2 | DE69414358D1 | 10.12.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP21799593 | 09.08.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5537959 | 23.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21799593 | 09.08.1993 |