EP0661419 - Internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, 438 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Takeshi c/o 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 438 / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94112445.5 | 09.08.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | JP19930217995 | 09.08.1993 Original published format: JP 21799593 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661419 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661419 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F01M1/16, F01M3/02 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
F01M3/02 (EP,US);
F01M1/16 (EP,US);
F02B2075/025 (EP,US);
F16N2230/02 (EP,US);
F16N2270/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/27] | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine | [1995/27] | English: | Internal combustion engine | [1995/27] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.11.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/22] | FR | 02.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [PXA]GB2270540 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [PX] 1-3,5,6,10,13 * the whole document * [A] 4,7-9; | [PX]EP0577081 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,7,10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS6483807 ; | [A]US4700671 (MATSUSHITA YUKIO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9220909 (JENSENS HANS MASKINFABRIK [DK]) [A] 1,5-9,11 * figure -; claims 1-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890705), vol. 13, no. 289, Database accession no. (M - 845), & JP01083807 A 19890329 (FUJI HEAVY IND) [A] 1-3,5 * abstract * * figure . * |