EP0638566 - 5-Aminoflavone derivatives, their preparation and their use as antibacterial, anti-estrogenic and/or antitumor agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akama, Tsutomu 1092-5, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Shun-ichi 11-26, Takasago-cho Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishida, Hiroyuki 410-1, Nameri, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Kimura, Uichiro 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 05 /
Gomi, Katsushige 541-12, Izushimada Susono-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 06 /
Saito, Hiromitsu 4-16-19, Nishiikuta, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/07] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94112509.8 | 10.08.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | JP19930199310 | 11.08.1993 Original published format: JP 19931093 | JP19930204356 | 18.08.1993 Original published format: JP 20435693 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638566 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638566 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/30, A61K31/35 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
C07D311/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/07] | Title | German: | 5-Aminoflavon Derivate, deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung als antibakterielle und/oder anti-östrogene Mittel und/oder Antitumormittel | [1995/07] | English: | 5-Aminoflavone derivatives, their preparation and their use as antibacterial, anti-estrogenic and/or antitumor agent | [1995/07] | French: | Dérivés de 5-aminoflavone, leur préparation et leur utilisation comme agents antibactériens et/ou antioestrogènes et/ou antitumoraux | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 11.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0374789 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.) [DY] 1-9 * page 13, line 30 - page 16, line 26; claims 1-12 * * page 2, line 9 - line 14 *; | JPH02138277 [ ] (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.); | JPH04282380 [ ] (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.); | [PY]EP0556720 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.) [PY] 1-9 * page 10, line 20 - page 12, line 20; claims 1-9 * | [DY] - JOSHI K.C. & JAUHAR A.K., "Studies in fluorochalkones & related compounds: Part II - Synthesis of fluorocoumaranones & fluoroflavones", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (196311), vol. 1, pages 477 - 479 [DY] 1-9 * compounds of formula II *; page 478; table 2 * | [DY] - SUGAYA T. ET AL., "Preparation of 5-aminoflavone derivatives as antitumor agents", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19901105), vol. 113, no. 19, Database accession no. 171775n, page 682, column 1 [DY] 1-9 * abstract * | [Y] - SHIDA Y. ET AL., "Preparation of 5-aminochromone derivatives as neoplasm inhibitors", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930705), vol. 119, no. 1, Database accession no. 8593s, page 882, column 2 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 47, Database accession no. 92-384929 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - SHAH K.G. ET AL., "Phytochemical studies and antiestrogenic activity of Butea frondosa flowers", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19911125), vol. 115, no. 21, Database accession no. 228319q, page 567, column 2 [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [ ] - INDIAN J. PHARM. SCI., (1990), vol. 52, no. 6, pages 272 - 275 |