EP0642792 - Stabilized solutions of platinum (II) antitumor agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaplan, Murray A. 1026 Glencove Road Syracuse, NY 13206 / US | 02 /
Phusanti, Lawan 6842 Rt. 20 Lafayette, NY 13084 / US | 03 /
Perrone, Robert K. 7353 Tomwood Drive Liverpool, NY 13090 / US | 04 /
Stenberg, Scott R. 7215 Van Buren Road Baldwinsville, NY 13027 / US | 05 /
Agharkar, Sheeram 5104 Waterford Wood way Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US | 06 /
Bogardus, Joseph B. 8239 Penstock Way Manlius, NY 13104 / US | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/11] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94112519.7 | 10.08.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | US19930105817 | 11.08.1993 Original published format: US 105817 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642792 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0642792 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/28, A61K9/08, A61K47/12 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/282 (KR);
A61K31/28 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/11] | Extension states | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stabile Lösungen von Platin-II-Antitumorverbindungen | [1995/11] | English: | Stabilized solutions of platinum (II) antitumor agents | [1995/11] | French: | Solutions stables d'agent antitumeur du platine-II | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.01.1998
25.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE PLIVA - Lachema, a.s. Karásek 1 621 33 Brno / CZ Opponent's representative Pramberger, Karin, et al, et al Pliva London Limited Vision House Bedford Road GB-Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.01.1998
25.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE PLIVA - Lachema, a.s. Karasek 28 621 33 Brno / CZ Opponent's representative Pramberger, Karin, et al, et al Pliva London Limited Vision House Bedford Road GB-Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 3QB / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.01.1998
25.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE Lachema a.s. Karasek 28 621 33 Brno / CZ Opponent's representative Schrell, Andreas, Dr., et al, et al Gleiss & Grosse, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Maybachstrasse 6 A 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.01.1998
25.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE Lachema a.s. Karasek 28 621 33 Brno / CZ Opponent's representative Gleiss & Grosse, et al, et al Maybachstrasse 6 A 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.01.1998
25.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE PLIVA - Lachema, a.s. Karásek 1 621 33 Brno / CZ Opponent's representative Miller, Andreas, et al, et al Miller Rechtsanwälte Schreiberstrasse 20 79098 Freiburg / DE | 28.01.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.08.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 26.03.2010 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2010/31] | Appeal following opposition | 11.10.2003 | Appeal received No. T0993/03 | 09.12.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.01.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 16.09.2003 | Appeal received | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2007 | GB | 10.08.2007 | IE | 10.08.2007 | IT | 10.08.2007 | LU | 10.08.2007 | ES | 11.08.2007 | SE | 11.08.2007 | BE | 31.08.2007 | CH | 31.08.2007 | DK | 31.08.2007 | FR | 31.08.2007 | LI | 31.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | PT | 11.02.2008 | DE | 01.03.2008 | NL | 01.03.2008 | GR | 04.03.2008 | [2010/05] |
Former [2009/13] | AT | 10.08.2007 | |
GB | 10.08.2007 | ||
IE | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 11.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
DK | 31.08.2007 | ||
FR | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 11.02.2008 | ||
DE | 01.03.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | ||
GR | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 10.08.2007 | |
GB | 10.08.2007 | ||
IE | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 11.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
DK | 31.08.2007 | ||
FR | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 11.02.2008 | ||
DE | 01.03.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 10.08.2007 | |
GB | 10.08.2007 | ||
IE | 10.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
DK | 31.08.2007 | ||
FR | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 11.02.2008 | ||
DE | 01.03.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 10.08.2007 | |
IE | 10.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
DK | 31.08.2007 | ||
FR | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 11.02.2008 | ||
DE | 01.03.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 10.08.2007 | |
IE | 10.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
DK | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 11.02.2008 | ||
DE | 01.03.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 10.08.2007 | |
SE | 11.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
DK | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 11.02.2008 | ||
DE | 01.03.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 10.08.2007 | |
SE | 11.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
DK | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 11.02.2008 | ||
DE | 01.03.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 10.08.2007 | |
SE | 11.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 11.02.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | SE | 11.08.2007 | |
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 11.02.2008 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | SE | 11.08.2007 | |
CH | 31.08.2007 | ||
LI | 31.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4140707 (CLEARE MICHAEL J, et al) [DA] 1-16 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0334551 (ABIC LTD [IL]) [DA] 1-16* abstract *; | [DA]EP0401896 (PHARMACHEMIE BV [NL]) [DA] 1-16 * claims 1-6 * |