Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0640407
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.02.2000 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
11.11.1999 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
11.11.1999 |
Revocation of patent |
|
20.04.1999 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
16.03.1999 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
10.12.1998 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
05.10.1998 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
26.06.1998 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 12.08.1998 [1998/33] |
24.06.1998 |
Observations of proprietor to parties involved |
|
24.06.1998 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
28.04.1998 |
Observations of proprietor to parties involved |
|
28.04.1998 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
20.02.1998 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
16.10.1997 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
25.07.1997 |
Opposition filed |
published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] |
23.07.1997 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
25.10.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] |
29.06.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.06.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.06.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.05.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.03.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.11.1995 |
First examination report |
|
13.01.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] |
13.01.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] |