Designated contracting states | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | Examination procedure | 21.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | European patent granted | 11.12.1996 | Opposition procedure | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 28.02.1997 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 01.03.1995 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT | | Event date: | 11.12.1996 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT | | Event date: | 01.03.1995 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19941123 | | Event date: | 10.01.1996 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19951127 | | Event date: | 10.01.1997 | | Event description: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L. | | Event date: | 23.01.1997 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59401248 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19970123 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 19.02.1997 | | Event description: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 19970125 | | Event date: | 10.09.1997 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | VITS-MASCHINENBAU GMBH | Effective DATE: | 19970717 | | Event date: | 12.04.2000 | | Event description: | GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE | Free Format Text: | 991021 | | Event date: | 12.04.2000 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 19991021 | | Event date: | 12.08.1998 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | VITS-MASCHINENBAU GMBH | Effective DATE: | 19970717 | | Event date: | 31.07.1999 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 19990731 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 22.07.1999 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19990722 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 13.07.1999 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19990713 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 25.10.1996 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 29.06.1996 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 12.06.1996 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 24.05.1996 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Event date: | 13.01.1995 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 25.02.2000 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | | Event date: | 25.02.2000 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271 | | Event date: | 11.11.1999 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS REVO | | Event date: | 26.06.1998 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 24.06.1998 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | | Event date: | 28.04.1998 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 20.02.1998 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 16.10.1997 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 25.07.1997 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 23.07.1997 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | |